+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On January 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-003-000
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Arrived in House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 038-010-001
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/1-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1-1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1
+ − Votes (4)
May 15, 2018: SB2343 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 26, 2018: SB2343 - Third Reading
April 17, 2018: SFA0001 - Judiciary
February 28, 2018: SB2343 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor