+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Health
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Medicaid
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor