+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0700
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 9, 2004
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 013-000-000
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin Joyce
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
- Recalled to Second Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that sustaining funds grants shall be in an amount up to 50% (instead of equal to 50%) of a grantee's third year grant funding under the Community Health Center Expansion Act.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2335 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2335 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor