+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0727
- Effective Date July 14, 2004
- Governor Approved
On May 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Housing and Urban Development Committee; 020-000-000
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Housing and Urban Development Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William E. Peterson
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Federally Subsidized Housing Preservation Act. Provides that an appraisal of assisted housing in connection with a sale to a tenant association shall be based on the property's highest and best use. Provides that the Act does not apply to an owner's sale or other disposition of assisted housing in a manner pursuant to which the property after the sale or other disposition continues to be assisted housing as defined in the Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 310 ILCS 60/1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1151
- 310 ILCS 60/3 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1153
- 310 ILCS 60/4 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1154
- 310 ILCS 60/5 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1155
- 310 ILCS 60/6 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1156
- 310 ILCS 60/7 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1157
- 310 ILCS 60/10.1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1160.1
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2004: SB2329 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 27, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2329 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor