+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0699
- Effective Date July 29, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Fred Crespo
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Syverson
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
- Postponed - Human Services
- Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 004
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill as amended by Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 with the following changes: In exemptions from the definition of "day care center", includes programs that comply with the standards of the Illinois Department of Public Health or the local health department, the Illinois State Fire Marshal, and specific health and safety requirements (rather than meet any appropriate State or local health and fire safety standards). Provides that the programs perform and maintain authorization and results of criminal history checks through specified law enforcement agencies and registries (rather than perform criminal background checks and sexual abuse and child abuse checks). Provides that the programs make hiring decisions in accordance with prohibitions against specified barrier crimes (rather than have standards of care adopted by the governing body of the entity with specified requirements). Provides that the programs must comply with staff qualification and training standards established by rule by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the standards shall be set after review of specific information. Provides that an out-of-school time program must comply with only those staff qualifications and training standards set for the program by the State or federal entity issuing funds. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides an exemption from the definition of "day care center" for programs that serve only school-age children and youth, that are operated by an entity organized to promote childhood learning, child and youth development, educational or recreational activities, or character-building, that also operate primarily during out-of-school time or at times when school is not normally in session, that meet any appropriate State or local health and fire safety standards, that perform criminal background checks and sexual abuse and child abuse checks on all employees and volunteers who work with children, that have standards of care adopted by the governing body of the entity that, at a minimum, include staff ratios and staff training and have mechanisms for assessing and enforcing the program's compliance with the standards, that provide parents with written disclosure that the operations of the program are not regulated by licensing requirements, and that obtain records showing the first and last name and date of birth of the child, name, address, and telephone number of each parent, emergency contact information, and written authorization for medical care. Provides that programs or portions of programs under the exemption that request funding from the Child Care Assistance Program (CCAP) must annually meet the eligibility requirements under the CCAP. Provides that certain day care providers are exempt from licensure, and the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide written verification of exemption and description of compliance with standards for the health, safety, and development of the children who receive the services upon submission by the provider of, in addition to any other documentation required by the Department, a notarized statement that the facility complies with: (1) the standards of the Department of Public Health or local health department, (2) the fire safety standards of the State Fire Marshal, and (3) if operated in a public school building, the health and safety standards of the State Board of Education.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 10/2.09 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212.09
- 225 ILCS 10/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 2213