+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0744
- Effective Date May 8, 2006
- Governor Approved
On April 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 016-000-000
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 22, 2006
- Second Reading
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 16, 2006
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Eliminates the provision that the additional good conduct credit awarded to a prisoner who passes the high school level Test of General Educational Development (GED) while the prisoner is incarcerated applies only if the prisoner receives a GED certificate. Provides that the good conduct credit shall be available only to those prisoners who have not previously earned a high school diploma or a GED. Provides that if, after an award of the GED good conduct credit has been made and the Department of Corrections determines that the prisoner was not eligible, then the award shall be revoked. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-1