+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 7, 2020
- Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason Plummer
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor