+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0959
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date September 17, 2008
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02-July 10, 2008
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 043-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Susan Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 074-038-001
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02-May 31, 2008
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Susan Garrett
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 023-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Fortner
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Energy; 011-001-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Energy; 008-002-002
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2008
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Carole Pankau
- Sponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Electronic Products Recycling and Reuse Act. Requires manufacturers, retailers, collectors, and recyclers to perform certain duties related to recycling or reusing certain electronic products. Sets forth goals for manufacturers for the recycling of the electronic products. Requires manufacturers and recyclers of the electronic products to register with the Environmental Protection Agency and pay a registration fee. Sets forth standards for recycling facilities of the electronic products. Sets forth requirements for the Department of Central Management Services in the procurement of electronic devices. Sets forth penalties for the violation of the Act. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Electronics Recycling Fund. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 1 with changes. Includes printers within the definition of a "covered electronic device" or "CED". Adds definitions and changes other definitions. Makes changes to statewide recycling and reuse goals. Provides for Electronic Industry Recycling Awards. Makes changes to penalties. Removes enforcement by State's Attorneys (now, enforcement is by the Attorney General or State's Attorneys). Requires the Pollution Control Board to review petitions from units of local government concerning their financial ability to collect CEDs and EEDs. Makes other changes. Makes technical and grammatical corrections. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 415 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1001