+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 011-000-000
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
May 10, 2018: SB2312 - Appropriations II
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor