+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Avery Bourne
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-021-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-001-006
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 003
Makes changes concerning the primary State aid provisions. With respect to additional weights, changes certain references from "statewide average percentage" to "statewide weighted-average percentage". With respect to available local resources per pupil, removes the language providing that the calculation of available local resources for the Chicago school district shall exclude up to $250,000,000 of any amounts actually paid by the board of education into a Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund.
Senate Amendment 002
Includes laboratory and alternative schools in the definition of "Hold Harmless State Funding". Defines "Residential Boarding School Program". In provisions concerning supplemental grants, provides that provisions concerning the calculation of operating tax rates by the State Board of Education become operative in the 2018-2019 school year and decreases various thresholds for receiving supplemental adequacy grants. Provides for hold harmless State funding for laboratory and alternative schools in school years 2016-2017 through 2019-2020. Adds provisions concerning an average daily attendance count adjustment for a residential boarding school within certain school districts. Makes other changes.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Better Funding for Better Schools Act. Amends the Economic Development Area Tax Increment Allocation Act, State Finance Act, Property Tax Code, Illinois Pension Code, State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act, Innovation Development and Economy Act, County Economic Development Project Area Property Tax Allocation Act, County Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1991, Illinois Municipal Code, Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1995, School Code, Educational Opportunity for Military Children Act, and Illinois Public Aid Code. Sets forth provisions concerning the basis for apportionment of primary State financial aid to the common schools for the 2016-2017 and subsequent school years. Makes changes concerning pensions, block grants, a system for accounting for revenues and expenditures, school district report cards, special education, transitional bilingual education, the transfer of moneys, tax levies, summer school grants, and transportation, and makes other related changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (80)
- 115 ILCS 5/20 - from Ch. 48, par. 1720
- 20 ILCS 620/7 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1007
- 30 ILCS 105/13.2 - from Ch. 127, par. 149.2
- 35 ILCS 200/18-200 -
- 35 ILCS 200/18-249 -
- 40 ILCS 5/16-158 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-158
- 40 ILCS 5/17-127 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-127
- 40 ILCS 15/1.1 -
- 50 ILCS 470/33 -
- 55 ILCS 85/7 - from Ch. 34, par. 7007
- 55 ILCS 90/50 - from Ch. 34, par. 8050
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-3
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-8 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-8
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.6-35 -
- 65 ILCS 110/50 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 1A-8
- 105 ILCS 5/1B-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 1B-5
- 105 ILCS 5/1B-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 1B-6
- 105 ILCS 5/1B-7 - from Ch. 122, par. 1B-7
- 105 ILCS 5/1B-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 1B-8
- 105 ILCS 5/1C-1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1C-2 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1D-1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1E-20 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1F-20 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1F-62 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1H-20 -
- 105 ILCS 5/1H-70 -
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.28 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.28
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.33 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.33
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.51.5 -
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.66 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.66
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.66b -
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.84 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.84
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.109a -
- 105 ILCS 5/3-14.21 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-14.21
- 105 ILCS 5/7-14A - from Ch. 122, par. 7-14A
- 105 ILCS 5/10-17a - from Ch. 122, par. 10-17a
- 105 ILCS 5/10-19 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-19
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.5a - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.5a
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.20 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.20
- 105 ILCS 5/10-29 -
- 105 ILCS 5/11E-135 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13A-8 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13B-20.20 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13B-45 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13B-50 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13B-50.10 -
- 105 ILCS 5/13B-50.15 -
- 105 ILCS 5/14-7.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-7.02
- 105 ILCS 5/14-7.02b -
- 105 ILCS 5/14-7.03 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-7.03
- 105 ILCS 5/14-13.01 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-13.01
- 105 ILCS 5/14C-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 14C-1
- 105 ILCS 5/14C-12 - from Ch. 122, par. 14C-12
- 105 ILCS 5/17-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 17-1
- 105 ILCS 5/17-1.2 -
- 105 ILCS 5/17-1.5 -
- 105 ILCS 5/17-2.11 - from Ch. 122, par. 17-2.11
- 105 ILCS 5/17-2A - from Ch. 122, par. 17-2A
- 105 ILCS 5/17-3.6 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/18-4.3 - from Ch. 122, par. 18-4.3
- 105 ILCS 5/18-8.05 -
- 105 ILCS 5/18-8.10 -
- 105 ILCS 5/18-8.15 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/18-9 - from Ch. 122, par. 18-9
- 105 ILCS 5/18-12 - from Ch. 122, par. 18-12
- 105 ILCS 5/26-16 -
- 105 ILCS 5/27-8.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-8.1
- 105 ILCS 5/27A-9 -
- 105 ILCS 5/27A-11 -
- 105 ILCS 5/29-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 29-5
- 105 ILCS 5/34-2.3 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-2.3
- 105 ILCS 5/34-8.4 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.30 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-43.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-43.1
- 105 ILCS 5/34-53 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-53
- 105 ILCS 70/25 -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.4 -