+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0797
- Effective Date August 11, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Larry K. Bomke
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 27, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Veterans Affairs Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the memorial shall honor persons who earned (i) the Southwest Asia Service Medal, (ii) the Afghanistan Campaign Medal for service in Operation Enduring Freedom, (iii) the Iraqi Campaign Medal for service in Operation Iraqi Freedom, or (iv) the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal for service in either Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2008: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 22, 2008: SB2302 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 22, 2008
April 8, 2008: SB2302 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor