+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0124
- Effective Date August 4, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones