+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 18, 2022
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-3
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3.5 -
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-5 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-5
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-7 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-7