+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gary Hannig
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 10, 2008: SB2296 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 10, 2008
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor