+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 605/7.1 - from Ch. 127, par. 133b10.1
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: SB2291 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor