+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203
+ − Vote
April 9, 2008: SB2282 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2008
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor