+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0698
- Effective Date July 29, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-028-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John D. Anthony
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Restorative Justice; 008-000-000
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Restorative Justice
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Special Committee on Restorative Justice
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the condition of parole, aftercare release, or mandatory supervised release that the subject not knowingly associate with other persons on parole, aftercare release, or mandatory supervised release without prior written permission of his or her parole agent or aftercare specialist does not apply when the association involves activities related to community programs, worship services, volunteering, and engaging families. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-7
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2016: SB2282 - Third Reading
May 17, 2016: SB2282 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 22, 2016: SB2282 - Third Reading
April 18, 2016: SB2282 - Committee on Restorative Justice
April 18, 2016: SCA0001 - Committee on Restorative Justice
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor