+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 18, 2004 in the House:
- Verified
- Override Governor Veto - House Lost 066-050-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 10, 2004 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. William B. Black
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2004
- Arrived in House
On November 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 040-014-001
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 8, 2004
On August 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-022-002
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture and Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Careen Gordon
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation Committee
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 043-013-001
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 007-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Recreational Trails of Illinois Act with respect to the Off-Highway Vehicle Trails Fund. Allows the Department of Natural Resources to use money from the Fund for construction of motorized recreational trails on Department owned or managed land that is not designated a nature preserve under the Illinois Natural Areas Preservation Act or is not contained in a report submitted under the Illinois Natural Areas Preservation Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
November 18, 2004: SB2272 - Motion - Thursday, November 18, 2004
November 9, 2004: SB2272 - Motion - Tuesday, November 09, 2004
May 12, 2004: SB2272 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 12, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2272 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor