+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0795
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 26, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black; As Amended
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 018-000-000
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Second Reading
- Fiscal Note Filed as Amended with Senate Amendment No. 2 from the Illinois Department of Public Health.
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the text of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Provides that the database must be established and administered in consultation with the Illinois Coalition for Nursing Resources, the Illinois Nurses Association, and other nursing associations. Provides that the information compiled in the database must be available under the Freedom of Information Act. Sets forth different objectives for the database. Deletes a provision setting forth the specific information that must be contained in the database. Provides that the Department may not disclose any data that it compiles in a manner that would allow the identification of any particular health care professional or health care facility. Provides that nothing in this amendatory Act shall be construed as requiring any health care facility to file or submit any data, information, or reports to any State agency or department.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the text of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Provides that the database must be established and administered in consultation with the Illinois Coalition for Nursing Resources, the Illinois Nurses Association, and other nursing associations. Provides that the information compiled in the database must be available under the Freedom of Information Act. Sets forth different objectives for the database. Deletes a provision setting forth the specific information that must be contained in the database. Provides that the Department may not disclose any data that it compiles in a manner that would allow the identification of any particular health care professional or health care facility. Provides that nothing in this amendatory Act shall be construed as requiring any health care facility to file or submit any data, information, or reports to any State agency or department.