+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor