+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
- Second Reading
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 014-002-000
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Vote
April 12, 2018: SB2269 - Appropriations II
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor