+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 006-004-000
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance & Pensions
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Barack Obama
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor