+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-102 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-102
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-103 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-103
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-104 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-104
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor