+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Revenue Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201
- 35 ILCS 5/218 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor