+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2013
- Do Pass Energy; 011-003-000
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Energy
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/9-201 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 9-201
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor