+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0751
- Effective Date July 23, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bill Mitchell
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2008
- Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2008: SB2252 - Third Reading - Saturday, May 31, 2008
April 1, 2008: SB2252 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor