+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Labor Subcommittee on Special Issues
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Labor Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen
- Assigned to Labor
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 130/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor