+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 90/17 - from Ch. 111, par. 4267
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor