+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Executive
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 605 ILCS 5/5-701.2 - from Ch. 121, par. 5-701.2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor