+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0697
- Effective Date July 29, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-050-000
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ron Sandack
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 008-002-000
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-000
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2016
- Second Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2016
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-003-000
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (38)
- 20 ILCS 2630/5.2 -
- 410 ILCS 130/65 -
- 620 ILCS 5/43d - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.43d
- 620 ILCS 5/43e - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.43e
- 625 ILCS 5/2-118 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 2-118
- 625 ILCS 5/2-118.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 2-118.1
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106.1a -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-208.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-208.1
- 625 ILCS 5/6-514 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-514
- 625 ILCS 5/6-517 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-517
- 625 ILCS 5/11-401 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-401
- 625 ILCS 5/11-500 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-500
- 625 ILCS 5/11-500.1 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.1 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501.2
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.4 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501.4
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.4-1 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.6 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-501.6
- 625 ILCS 5/11-501.8 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-507 -
- 625 ILCS 40/5-7 -
- 625 ILCS 40/5-7.1 -
- 625 ILCS 40/5-7.2 -
- 625 ILCS 40/5-7.4 -
- 625 ILCS 40/5-7.6 -
- 625 ILCS 45/5-16 -
- 625 ILCS 45/5-16a - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 315-11a
- 625 ILCS 45/5-16a.1 -
- 625 ILCS 45/5-16c -
- 705 ILCS 405/5-125 -
- 720 ILCS 550/4 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 704
- 720 ILCS 550/5.3 new -
- 720 ILCS 550/17.5 new -
- 720 ILCS 600/3.5 -
- 725 ILCS 5/115-15 -
- 725 ILCS 5/115-23 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.9 -
+ − Votes (4)
May 18, 2016: SB2228 - Third Reading
May 4, 2016: SB2228 - Restorative Justice
April 19, 2016: SB2228 - Third Reading
March 9, 2016: SB2228 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor