+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (55)
- Session Sine Die
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-043-000
- Motion Filed To Reconsider the Vote on Motion Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Tabled
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - January 8, 2023
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-005-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Prevailed 064-039-000
- Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Judicial Note Request is Inapplicable
- State Debt Impact Note Request is Inapplicable
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Public Safety; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Safety
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Public Safety
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Division of Criminal Investigation of the Illinois State Police shall conduct other investigations as provided by law, including, but not limited to, investigations of human trafficking, illegal drug trafficking, and illegal firearms trafficking. Provides that the Division of Criminal Investigation shall provide statewide coordination and strategy pertaining to firearm-related intelligence, firearms trafficking interdiction, and investigations. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a petitioner may request a plenary firearms restraining order of up to one-year, but not less than 6 months (rather than 6 months). Provides that the order may be renewed for an additional period of up to one year. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to manufacture, deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be manufactured, delivered, sold, or purchased by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, with exemptions, and provides penalties. Prohibits the manufacture, delivery, sale, purchase, or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices, with specified exemptions, and provides penalties. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code to make conforming changes. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that "amusement ride" includes any dry slide, alpine slide, or toboggan slide except (1) any slide that is placed in a playground and that does not normally require the supervision or services of a person responsible for its operation; or (2) any slide that is not open to the general public and for which admission is monitored and strictly controlled by invitation, company or group identification, or other means of identification (rather than providing that "amusement ride" includes any dry slide, alpine slide, or toboggan slide that a person must pay to gain access to, but not a slide at a private residence, public or nonpublic school, daycare, or public park).
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 430 ILCS 85/2-2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4052
- 430 ILCS 85/2-1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4051
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-35 - was 20 ILCS 2605/55a-3
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-51.1
- 30 ILCS 500/1-10
- 430 ILCS 65/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-2
- 430 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-4
- 430 ILCS 65/4.1 new
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 430 ILCS 67/40
- 430 ILCS 67/45
- 430 ILCS 67/55
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-1
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.9 new
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.10 new