+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (63)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1056
- Effective Date July 31, 2006
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,03
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,03
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-024-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 034-024-000
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-043-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 5, 2006
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 30, 2006
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 13, 2006
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 7, 2006
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 2
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black; As Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black; As Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Maloney
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2006
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 9, 2006
- Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Higher Education
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that if a State university determines that a student needs remedial coursework, then the university must require that the student complete the remedial coursework before pursuing his or her chosen course of study (instead of just requiring that the student complete the remedial coursework).
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Provides that if a State university determines that a student needs remedial coursework (instead of if a State university admits a student who needs remedial coursework), then the university must require that the student complete the remedial coursework. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that a student is not ineligible for Monetary Award Program consideration if (1) a State university that the student was enrolled at required that the student complete remedial coursework and (2) by subtracting the total number of semester credit hours, not to exceed 30 semester credit hours, of required remedial coursework that the student successfully completed and received award payments for, the student has received less than the equivalent of 135 semester credit hours of award payments.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 205/9.07 - from Ch. 144, par. 189.07