+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0617
- Effective Date July 22, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Postponed - Criminal Law
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Replaces the provisions in the introduced bill with the following. Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides if a consistent DNA profile has been identified in a sexual assault case by comparing the submitted sexual assault evidence with a known standard from a suspect or with DNA profiles in the CODIS database, the Department of State Police shall notify the investigating law enforcement agency of the results in writing, and the Department shall provide an automatic courtesy copy of the written notification to the appropriate State's Attorney's Office for tracking and further action, as necessary. Beginning June 1, 2016 or on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, whichever is later, each law enforcement agency must conduct an annual inventory of all sexual assault cases in the custody of the law enforcement agency and provide written notice of its annual findings to the State's Attorney's Office having jurisdiction to ensure sexual assault cases are being submitted as provided by law. Beginning January 1, 2017 and each year thereafter, the Department of State Police shall publish a quarterly report on its website, indicating a breakdown of the number of sexual assault case submissions from every law enforcement agency. Effective immediately.