+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 31, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On July 15, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) JULY 31, 2004
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 15, 2004
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Home Rule Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 31, 2004 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2004
On May 30, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 21, 2004 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Revenue Committee; 005-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Re-committed to Rules Committee
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate **
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-007-001
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2004
- Do Pass State Government; 005-002-000
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Sets forth procedures, including the straight-line accounting method, for calculating the deduction for the depreciation of property for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2004. Sets forth procedures for calculating depreciation and basis adjustments for property placed into service in tax years ending before December 31, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -