+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 525 ILCS 10/2 - from Ch. 5, par. 932
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: SB0221 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor