+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; - 3/16/2011 - Postponed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor