+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-000-005
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor