+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-004-003
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 030-019-000
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 007-003-000
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the amendatory language applies only to students who meet certain requirements for being a resident of Illinois but are not necessarily a citizen or permanent resident of the United States.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2016: SB2196 - Higher Education
April 20, 2016: SB2196 - Third Reading
April 5, 2016: SB2196 - Higher Education
April 5, 2016: SCA0001 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor