+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0546
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/19-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 19-1
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2021: SB2193 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: SB2193 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 23, 2021: SB2193
April 13, 2021: SB2193 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor