+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor