+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (61)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2021
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-042-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Terri Bryant
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Win Stoller
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Craig Wilcox
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan McConchie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sims
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2021
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Revenue
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Provides for an effective date of January 1, 2022.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that a "qualifying Illinois data center" means a new or existing data center that, among other criteria, is located in the State of Illinois, is located within a 5-mile geographic radius, and is connected by common infrastructure. Provides that a data center and an associated tenant may enter into an ancillary memorandum of understanding, as prescribed by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, for purposes of receipt of an exemption. Provides that the Department is authorized to conform existing memorandums of understanding with the provisions concerning data center investments. Provides that within 180 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 120nd General Assembly, all new and existing data centers seeking a certificate of exemption under this Section shall require the contractor to enter into a labor peace agreement with any union representing workers who operate and maintain a critical system or equipment used or maintained by the data center. Modifies the definition of "tenant". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that a "qualifying Illinois data center" means a new or existing data center that, among other criteria, is located in the State of Illinois, is located within a 5-mile geographic radius, and is connected by common infrastructure. Provides that a data center and an associated tenant may enter into an ancillary memorandum of understanding, as prescribed by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, for purposes of receipt of an exemption. Provides that the Department is authorized to conform existing memorandums of understanding with the provisions concerning data center investments. Modifies the definition of "tenant". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.