+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
On May 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Executive
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/3-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-5