+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0711
- Effective Date July 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2171 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 3, 2004: SB2171 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 03, 2004
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor