+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine Hammond
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013
- Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 110 ILCS 305/7e-5 -
- 110 ILCS 520/8d-5 -
- 110 ILCS 660/5-88 -
- 110 ILCS 665/10-88 -
- 110 ILCS 670/15-88 -
- 110 ILCS 675/20-88 -
- 110 ILCS 680/25-88 -
- 110 ILCS 685/30-88 -
- 110 ILCS 690/35-88 -
- 110 ILCS 805/6-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 106-4
- 110 ILCS 805/6-4a -
+ − Vote
April 11, 2013: SB2167 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 11, 2013
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor