+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0561
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 15, 2016
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-001-000
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2016
- Second Reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2016
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/17-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 17-2
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: SB2167 - Third Reading
May 10, 2016: SB2167 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 7, 2016: SB2167 - Third Reading
February 17, 2016: SB2167 - Criminal Law - Feb 17, 2016
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor