+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On August 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Brady
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.1