+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary Subcommittee on Property and the Environment
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Judiciary Subcommittee on Property and the Environment
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John O. Jones
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor