+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-001
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the certified statement by the religious institution that states that the institution has received an exemption from the Illinois Board of Higher Education as a religious institution providing religious instruction only must, among other requirements, be included in all transcripts issued by the institution.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 110 ILCS 1005/1.5 new -
- 110 ILCS 1010/11 - from Ch. 144, par. 241
- 110 ILCS 1010/11.5 new -