+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor