+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0960
- Effective Date August 20, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 17, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-017-007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
- Held in Executive
- Held in Executive
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Creates the Prevention of Cigarette Sales to Minors Act. Provides that it is unlawful for any person engaged in the business of selling cigarettes to ship or cause to be shipped any cigarettes, unless the person shipping the cigarettes: (1) is a person licensed as a distributor under either the Cigarette Tax Act or the Cigarette Use Tax Act; or (2) ships them to an export warehouse proprietor. Provides that when a peace officer of this State or any duly authorized officer or employee of the Illinois Department of Public Health or Department of Revenue discovers any cigarettes which have been or which are being shipped or transported in violation of the Act, he or she shall seize and take possession of the cigarettes, and the cigarettes shall be subject to a forfeiture action pursuant to the procedures provided under the Cigarette Tax Act or Cigarette Use Tax Act. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to impose a civil penalty not to exceed $5,000 on any person engaged in the business of selling cigarettes who ships or causes to be shipped any such cigarettes to any person in this State in violation of the Act. Effective July 1, 2004.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Creates the Prevention of Cigarette Sales to Minors Act. Provides that it is unlawful for any person engaged in the business of selling cigarettes to ship or cause to be shipped any cigarettes, unless the person shipping the cigarettes: (1) is a person licensed as a distributor under either the Cigarette Tax Act or the Cigarette Use Tax Act; or (2) ships them to an export warehouse proprietor. Provides that when a peace officer of this State or any duly authorized officer or employee of the Illinois Department of Public Health or Department of Revenue discovers any cigarettes which have been or which are being shipped or transported in violation of the Act, he or she shall seize and take possession of the cigarettes, and the cigarettes shall be subject to a forfeiture action pursuant to the procedures provided under the Cigarette Tax Act or Cigarette Use Tax Act. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to impose a civil penalty not to exceed $5,000 on any person engaged in the business of selling cigarettes who ships or causes to be shipped any such cigarettes to any person in this State in violation of the Act. Effective July 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 675/1 - from Ch. 23, par. 2357